Wiley, Elizabeth (CPSO#: 20338)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1930

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1945 RCPSC Specialist
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1947 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1941
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 1995