Wiley, Kate Margaret (CPSO#: 67641)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015