Wilk, Edward Joseph (CPSO#: 19053)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Dr. Wilk Tel: (416) 239-9942
Date Received: 20 Aug 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jan 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010