Wilkes, Peter Raymond Hyde (CPSO#: 62329)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 761-4379
Fax: (613) 761-4925
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER RAYMOND HYDE WILKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1992