Wilkes, Warren Arthur (CPSO#: 74394)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4745 Ogletown-Stanton Road
Suite 220
Newark DE  19713
United States
Phone: 302-623-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
USA - Delaware
USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WARREN ARTHUR WILKES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2011