Wilkie, Allan Vance (CPSO#: 71025)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 06 Dec 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Dec 1997


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 1997 to 29 Apr 1997
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Apr 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Dec 1997