Wilkins, Douglas Frank (CPSO#: 51777)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4588
Fax: (613) 761-4177
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Wilkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wilkins ( CPSO# 51777 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4588

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS FRANK WILKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 28 Oct 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1999