Wilkins, Kathryn Ruth (CPSO#: 59564)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 105
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone: (705) 726-7427
Fax: (705) 725-7313
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathryn R. Wilkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wilkins ( CPSO# 59564 )

Business Address:
Suite 105
11 Lakeside Terrace
Barrie ON  L4M 0H9
Phone Number: (705) 726-7427

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 15 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN RUTH WILKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1989