Wilkinson, Jane Elizabeth (CPSO#: 51896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 2X5
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: (905) 876-7047
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jane Wilkinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wilkinson ( CPSO# 51896 )

Business Address:
7030 Derry Road
Milton ON  L9T 2X5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANE ELIZABETH WILKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985