Wilkinson, John William (CPSO#: 66431)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Building A
Unit 7
260 Holiday Inn Drive
Cambridge ON  N3C 4E8
Phone: 5196586801
Fax: 5196580155
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN WILLIAM WILKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1997