Wilkinson, Sharon Isobel (CPSO#: 29596)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:City Univ N Y Mount Sinai School of Med, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON ISOBEL WILKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILKINSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1977