Wilks, Rohan Jerome Osei (CPSO#: 105134)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Oct 2014 to 17 Jan 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2016