Willans, Martin John (CPSO#: 21099)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 21 Oct 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1967
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 11 May 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2011

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: August 3, 2011
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Martin John Willans has resigned from the College.