Willard, Peter Trevor (CPSO#: 60872)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone: (905) 714-0080
Fax: (905) 714-1828
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.T. Willard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Willard ( CPSO# 60872 )

Business Address:
6 - 165 Plymouth Road
Welland ON  L3B 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 714-0080

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 06 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER TREVOR WILLARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1993