Willems, Cara Lea Mary (CPSO#: 64948)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke General Hospital
Department of Nuclear Medicine
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400 Ext. 32005
Fax: (416) 747-3609
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARA LEA MARY WILLEMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLEMS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1993