Willer, Ronald Charles (CPSO#: 21532)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 495 Huntingdon Drive London, ON N6C 4J2; 641 Commissioners Road East London, ON N6C 2T9 Tel: 519 686 8585
Instructions: Patients seen at the 680 Huron Street location may access their medical records by sending a written request to 495 Huntingdon Drive.
Date Received: 02 Jun 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Feb 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014