Willerth, Michael Joseph Arthur (CPSO#: 69407)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jul 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Vascular Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jul 1998