Willett, Janice Ann (CPSO#: 53996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 215
955 Queen Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone: (705) 946-1332
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Willett Woolner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Woolner ( CPSO# 55940 )
Dr. J. Willett ( CPSO# 53996 )

Business Address:
215 - 955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 946-1332

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Sault Area Hospitals,Richard's Landing Site Richards Landing
Sault Area Hospitals,Thessalon Site Thessalon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 27 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANICE ANN WILLETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1987