Williams, Annamary Jean (CPSO#: 27077)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 1974

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1062 Ghislain
Suite 306
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3B2
Phone: (613) 632-4073
Fax: (613) 632-4454
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 20 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNAMARY JEAN WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1974