Williams, Anne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 54570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Mar 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Terrace On The Square
Suite 204 Level Two
8 -10 Rowan Street
St John's NL  A1B 2X3
Phone: (709) 738-8883
Fax: (709) 738-8898
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Care Corporation of
St John's
The General Hospital Health Science
300 Prince Phillip Drive
St John's NL  A1B 3V6
Canada
Phone: (709) 777-6300
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE ELIZABETH WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1988