Williams, Anthony David (CPSO#: 20993)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 28 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of London, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 1996
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 28 Jul 1998

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Dec 1996
Summary:

 In December 1996, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Williams guilty of professional misconduct, in 
 that he had been guilty of misconduct in a professional respect and of conduct unbecoming a 
 medical practitioner, under what became section 34(3)(c) of the Medical Act, 1970.  The Committee 
 further found Dr. Williams guilty of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 
 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession as 
 defined in s. 27(21); in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, as defined in s. 
 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable, or unprofessional.

In July 1998, the Discipline Committee ordered Dr. Williams( 
 certificate of registration to be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): Oct 10, 1995