Williams, Betsy Anne (CPSO#: 52303)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Williams, Betsy (used until: 26 Jan 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Portuguese

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999