Williams, Brent Allen (CPSO#: 73778)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kidcrew Medical
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Canada
Phone: 416-654-5437
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brent Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Williams ( CPSO# 73778 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Haematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7424

Business Address:
Kidcrew Medical and Dental
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Phone Number: (416) 654-5437

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 May 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 20 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENT ALLEN WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2005