Williams, Brian Douglas (CPSO#: 20425)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Mar 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003