Williams, Bryan Edward (CPSO#: 60817)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 11 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryan E. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Jun 2012

Pending Hearings

Summary:

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Jun 2012
Summary:

 On June 11, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Bryan Edward Williams committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in the sexual abuse of a patient, and in that he 
 engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard 
 to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional. Dr. Williams admitted the allegations.

Patient A became a patient of Dr. 
 William's in approximately 1991 and she remained his patient up until 2008. Over the course of the 
 doctorpatient relationship, Patient A was treated for, among other things, anxiety, depression, 
 and suicidal ideation. In the course of this treatment, Dr. Williams prescribed to patient A 
 antianxiety and antidepressant medication. In February and March 2007, Dr. Williams had sexual 
 intercourse with patient A on approximately two occasions. Dr. Williams admitted drafting the 
 words in and encouraging patient A to send a recantation letter to the College. Dr. Williams also 
 admitted that his chart entry dated March 20, 2008 pertaining to patient A contained false 
 information.  

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	the Registrar revoke Dr. 
 William's certificate of registration, such revocation to take effect immediately.  
2.	Dr. 
 Williams attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
3.	Dr. Williams post an irrevocable letter of 
 credit or other security acceptable to the College, thirty (30) days of the date of this Order to 
 reimburse the College for funding it has or may provide to the complainant pursuant to section 
 85.7 of the Code.
4.	Dr. Williams pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650.00, within 
 thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): June 11-15, 2012