Williams, Carole Simone (CPSO#: 53072)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Email: info@rsrs.com
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016