Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Williams, Christopher Beverley (CPSO#: 67449)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Oct 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Oxford University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Oct 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Sep 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2006