Williams, Christopher Kwesi Oladipupo (CPSO#: 46568)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Yoruba

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Apartment 400
116 North Albert Street
Port Angeles WA  98362
United States
Phone: (360) 797-4472

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
USA - California
USA - New York
USA - Washington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 18 Apr 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 02 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KWESI OLADIPUPO WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1991