Williams, Clair Charles (CPSO#: 19247)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clair Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 13 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 21 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012