Williams, Daphne Taylor (CPSO#: 70044)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Family Medicine Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6860
Fax: (416) 530-6160
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Oct 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAPHNE TAYLOR WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 18 Nov 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Nov 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 1998