Williams, David Cecil (CPSO#: 29300)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Nepali

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MOHLTC
21st Floor, 393 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M2
Phone: (416)212-3831
Fax: (416)325-8412
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CECIL WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Apr 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1977