Williams, David Joshua (CPSO#: 77680)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2011