Williams, Eldon Stephen Vernon (CPSO#: 18310)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Sep 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 416.781.9083 or 1.888.781.9083 or fax 1.866.297.9338
Instructions: Contact DocuDavit
Date Received: 19 Dec 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 2013

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 20 Sep 1979
Summary:

 In September 1979, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Williams guilty of professional misconduct, 
 as defined in s. 26(4) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he had a conflict of 
 interest.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Williams be fined the sum of $5000.00, and 
 that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of three months.  The Committee further 
 ruled, however, that this suspension would itself be suspended and replaced by the penalty of a 
 reprimand if the Doctor entered into a new lease with his tenant at reasonable rates, and provided 
 proof to the College that this undertaking had been satisfactorily completed by 1 October 1979.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 19 Sep 1979