Williams, Harold Ambrose (CPSO#: 09733)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1933

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1946 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1933
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Apr 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Sep 1989