Williams, Julie Michelle (CPSO#: 66819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jan 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
I W K Health Centre
Dept of Peds Anesthesia
5850/5980 University Avenue
P O Box 9700
Halifax NS  B3K 6R8
Phone: (902) 470-8251
Fax: (902) 470-7911
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospitals
Department of Anaesthesia
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 22 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE MICHELLE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 2000