Williams, Kim Jacqueline (CPSO#: 61115)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2000 Pepperell Parkway
Opelika AL  36804
United States
Phone: (334) 528-1154

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 1997