Williams, Lynne Kirsty (CPSO#: 94521)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Oct 2010 to 22 Dec 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 15 Aug 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 2013