Williams, Michael David (CPSO#: 63508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1992


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 - 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 376-2121 Ext. 2029
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2008

Dr. M. Williams ( CPSO# 63508 )

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound


Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1992