Williams, Owen Robert Tudor (CPSO#: 67573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Nov 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 30 Apr 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 01 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 30 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 30 Apr 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 30, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Owen Robert Tudor
            Williams in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Williams to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Williams is not currently practising medicine in Ontario. Dr.
                  Williams will provide the College with 60 days' notice of intent to
                  return to the practice of medicine in Ontario.