Williams, Paul Andrew (CPSO#: 72549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hillside Family Medicine
119 Isabella Street
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone: (705) 653-1801
Fax: (705) 653-5483
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Williams ( CPSO# 72549 )

Business Address:
Hillside Family Medicine
119 Isabella Street
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1801

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ANDREW WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000