Williams, Paula Bronwen (CPSO#: 30577)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jan 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone: (416) 465-6301
Fax: (416) 465-5754
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

201-240 Duncan Mill Rd.
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Canada
Phone: 416-840-5991
Fax: 647-729-4766
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paula B. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Williams ( CPSO# 30577 )

Business Address:
205 - 840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: (416) 645-6301

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULA BRONWEN WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 1979