Williams, Robert Edward (CPSO#: 22717)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Limited - Head Office Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3 Toll Free: 1-800-775-0093 Website: www.recordregistry.ca
Date Received: 07 Aug 2014

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 11, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Edward Williams to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 11, 2016.

Dr. Williams has resigned from the College. Should Dr. Williams return to practice, he will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for any of the following substances:

(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Schedule G of the Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27); or
(iv)Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)

See PDF for full Undertaking.
Download Full Document (PDF)