Williams, Robina Catherine (CPSO#: 25563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Dec 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Dec 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5 Bunny Glen Drive
St Davids ON  L0S 1P0
Phone: (289) 296-2875
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBINA CATHERINE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 1980