Williams, Ryan Anthony (CPSO#: 87198)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40817
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40817
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main St West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 40817
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Williams ( CPSO# 87198 )

Business Address:
Regional Rehabilitation Centre
300 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
355 Eglinton Street East
Toronto ON  M4P 1M5
Phone Number: (416) 545-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN ANTHONY WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 23 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012