Williams, Suzan Atina (CPSO#: 71410)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Oct 2001

Summary

Former Name: Williams, Suzan (used until: 16 Oct 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7758
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZAN ATINA WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2001