Williams, Tanya-Gay Marie (CPSO#: 59658)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 215
4025 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2P 2E3
Phone: (416) 283-5539
Fax: (416) 283-1636
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams ( CPSO# 59658 )

Business Address:
215 - 4025 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2P 2E3
Phone Number: (416) 283-5539

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TANYA-GAY MARIE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1989