Williams, Tara Margaret (CPSO#: 63741)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6486 Ext. 6010
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter B. Dirks Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams ( CPSO# 63741 )
Dr. P. Dirks ( CPSO# 60703 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Neurosurgery
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-1500


Corporation Name: Dr. Tara M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams ( CPSO# 63741 )
Dr. P. Dirks ( CPSO# 60703 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000


Corporation Name: T.M. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 5 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TARA MARGARET WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1992