Williams, Tina Watts (CPSO#: 62472)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone: (519) 843-2322
Fax: (519) 843-2705
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tina Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Williams ( CPSO# 62472 )

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Community Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1W 1W3
Phone Number: (519) 843-2322

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TINA WATTS WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991