Williams, Walter Shane (CPSO#: 80265)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
90 Kimberley Avenue
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2A4
Phone: (705) 637-0239
Fax: 888-272-5283
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. Shane Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Williams ( CPSO# 80265 )

Business Address:
2 - 90 Kimberley Avenue
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2A4
Phone Number: (705) 637-0239

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  March 3, 2009
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
NOTICE OF PARTIAL SUSPENSION/REINSTATEMENT OF HOSPITAL PRIVILEGES:

On March 3, 2009, Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare notified the College that Dr. Walter Shane Williams's privileges were partially suspended, and on April 28, 2009, notified the College that his privileges had been fully reinstated.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WALTER SHANE WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Sep 2003 to 22 Oct 2003
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006