Williams, Wendy Christina (CPSO#: 68220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thornhill Family Physicians
Unit 35
7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone: (905) 881-6510
Fax: (905) 881-6513
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Gibson Long Term Care
1925 Steeles Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2H 2H3
Canada
Phone: (416) 493-4666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Wendy C. Williams Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Williams ( CPSO# 68220 )

Business Address:
Thornhill Family Physicians
35 - 7700 Bathurst Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 7Y3
Phone Number: (905) 881-6510

Business Address:
Gibson Long Term Care
1925 Steeles Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2H 2H3
Phone Number: (416) 493-4666

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WENDY CHRISTINA WILLIAMS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WILLIAMS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1996